CHALLENGE CANCER UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising is via participants taking part in UK and overseas challenges e.g. walking Great Wall of China. The funds raised are distributed across 10 national cancer charities, supporting their work in the areas of awareness, prevention, research, treatment, support, and care. This supports cancer patients and their families, thus meeting our objectives and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- CHALLENGE FOR LIFE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £306.72k | £179.94k | £127.77k | £16.47k | £393 | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.24k | £217.53k | £119.38k | £120.48k | £1.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 06 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 18 August 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 28 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 28 August 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 24 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2016
(These accounts |
24 October 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 02 MAY 2013 AMENDED ON 20/11/2014
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO INSTITUTIONS, ORGANISATIONS OR GROUPS PROVIDING RESEARCH, TREATMENT, RAISING AWARENESS, AND PREVENTION OF CANCER AND ALSO TO SIMILAR ORGANISATIONS OR GROUPS PROVIDING CARE AND COMFORT TO THOSE SUFFERING FROM CANCER RELATED ILLNESSES. THE SUPPORT WILL APPLY TO NATIONAL, REGIONAL AND LOCAL ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS AS AGREED BY THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR DISCRETION.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window