THE SOCIETY OF MEDIATORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE SOCIETY OF MEDIATORS EXISTS WORLDWIDE TO: (1) EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT MEDIATION (2) CONTINUE THE EDUCATION OF MEDIATORS (3) PROMOTE MEDIATION (4) PROVIDE SUITABLE VENUES AND MEDIATORS FOR MEDIATION (5) ACCREDIT INDIVIDUAL MEDIATORS; AND (6) PROVIDE A LIBRARY ABOUT MEDIATION THE SOCIETY'S TRUSTEES WILL ALSO APPOINT A SUITABLE MEDIATOR WHERE THERE IS NO AGREEMENT BETWEEN PARTIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Botswana
- British Virgin Islands
- Cayman Islands
- Cyprus
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
- Gibraltar
- India
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- Namibia
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Rwanda
- Saint Helena
- Scotland
- Seychelles
- Sint Maarten
- South Africa
- Tanzania
- The Bahamas
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Uganda
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- 04 April 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruby Sandhu FRSA | Chair | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Cleaver | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Tack | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Medforth OBE | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ama Agbeze MBE | Trustee | 23 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diana Margaret Cawdell-Trew | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alex Fletcher | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Ingle | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joe Mulrooney | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Ealey | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hodge | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £347.32k | £249.13k | £310.60k | £139.47k | £257.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £350.76k | £250.55k | £302.17k | £156.78k | £254.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 OCT 2012 AS AMENDED ON 02/04/2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS MEDIATION CONFLICT MANAGEMENT. TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PURPOSES AND METHODS OF SUCH MEDIATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fourth Floor
218 Strand
London
WC2R 1AT
- Phone:
- 0207 353 3936
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window