Trustees THE SOCIETY OF MEDIATORS
Charity number: 1151526
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Muthupandi Ganesan FCIArb | Chair | 23 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ruby Sandhu FRSA | Trustee | 31 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Tack | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Medforth OBE | Trustee | 31 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ama Agbeze MBE | Trustee | 23 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diana Margaret Cawdell-Trew | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alex Fletcher | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Ingle | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joe Mulrooney | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Ealey | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hodge | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Collis | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR STIRLING PUGH FRCS | Trustee | 17 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
The Lord Strathcarron | Trustee | 29 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.