CHILDREN IN HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children in Hope supports educational and rehabilitation programs for disabled children run by Life Aid Centre an NGO based in Tiruvallur and Parameswaramangalam village in Tamil Nadu, India. Children in Hope supports Life Aid Centre and other NGOs to promote Education, vocational training, health care support, women's development, and environmental projects in rural parts of Tamil Nadu in India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gateshead
- India
Governance
- 14 August 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARVIN GOODORALLY | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR SHANMUGAM | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
MRS RAVI | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR RAVI | Trustee | 03 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.23k | £5.80k | £8.06k | £2.80k | £760 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.43k | £2.67k | £5.09k | £2.00k | £457 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 May 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 July 2021 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 AUG 2009 AS AMENDED ON 03/08/2013
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY SUPPORTING THE EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMMES OF A NGO CALLED 'LIFE AID CENTRE FOR THE DISABLED' IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF MOTHER TERESA MEMORIAL RESIDENTIAL SCHOOL FOR THE DEAF AND LEARNING DISABILITY CHILDREN IN TIRUVALLUR DISTRICT AND SHRINE VELANKANNI PRIMARY SCHOOL IN PARAMESWARAMANGALAM VILLAGE IN ARAKKONAM TALUK OF SOUTH INDIA. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY WORKING LOCALLY IN GATESHEAD AND NEWCASTLE COUNTY COUNCIL AREAS PROVIDING HEALTH EDUCATION AWARENESS TO REDUCE PROBLEMS LIKE SMOKING, DRINKING ALCOHOL DRUG MISUSE AND OBESITY OF ANY DESCRIPTION AMONG OLDER CHILDREN AND ADOLESCENTS OR IN NEED OF SUPPORT FOR THE FAMILY AS A RESULT OF SUCH PROBLEM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dunston Activity Centre
Ellison Road
GATESHEAD
NE11 9SS
- Phone:
- 01914335678
- Email:
- childreninhopeuk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window