THE LITERATURE PRIZE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Prize aims to promote reading and appreciation of literature for the public benefit by selecting and raising the profile of the very best works published each year. Through its events, website and other media, it seeks to engage readers and writers throughout the English-speaking world in cultural debate and in the celebration, sustainment and furtherance of the art of literature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 March 2013: CIO registration
- The Folio Academy Foundation (Working name)
- THE FOLIO PRIZE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW NICHOLSON KIDD | Chair | 11 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Anna Natalia Fairweather | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Suzy Lucas | Trustee | 01 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Amy Lashinsky | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
KATE VICTORIA HARVEY | Trustee | 11 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.12k | £179.95k | £207.78k | £228.50k | £140.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.23k | £187.66k | £189.19k | £168.71k | £210.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 February 2023 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 February 2023 | 111 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 February 2023 | 476 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 February 2023 | 476 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Mar 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE READING AND APPRECIATION OF LITERATURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SELECTING AND RAISING THE PROFILE OF THE VERY BEST WORKS OF FICTION PUBLISHED EACH YEAR, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE AWARD OF THE ANNUAL LITERATURE PRIZE (TO OPERATE PUBLICLY, FOR THE FORESEEABLE FUTURE, AS THE FOLIO PRIZE, ADOPTING THE NAME OF OUR SPONSOR). THE PRIZE RECOGNIZES SUPERB LITERARY MERIT IN A WORK WRITTEN IN ENGLISH AND PUBLISHED IN THE UK, AND IS OPEN TO WRITERS GLOBALLY. THROUGH ITS WEBSITE AND OTHER MEDIA, AS WELL AS COMMUNITY OUTREACH PROGRAMMES, THE LITERATURE PRIZE FOUNDATION WILL SEEK TO ENGAGE READERS AND WRITERS THROUGHOUT THE ENGLISH-SPEAKING WORLD IN CULTURAL DEBATE AND IN THE CELEBRATION, SUSTAINMENT AND FURTHERANCE OF THE ART OF LITERATURE, WHICH IT BELIEVES HAS THE CAPACITY TO ENRICH AND CHANGE PEOPLE'S LIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 Barnsbury Street
London
N1 1EJ
- Phone:
- 02035896881
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window