NCIFOUNDATIONS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY WILL UNDERTAKE ACTIVITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN THE UK AND IN VERY DEPRIVED COUNTRIES WORLDWIDE; THOSE IN EXTREMELY HIGH POVERTY AND AS SUCH WILL ASSIST GLOBAL COMMUNITIES IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Akrotiri
- American Samoa
- Andorra
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Brunei
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Christmas Island
- Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Easter Island
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Falkland Islands
- Faroe Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Greenland
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jersey
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Martinique
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Norfolk Island
- Northern Ireland
- Northern Mariana Islands
- North Korea
- Norway
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Réunion
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Helena
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- San Marino
- São Tomé And Principe
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- United States Virgin Islands
- Uruguay
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Wallis And Futuna
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 04 April 2013: CIO registration
- NCIFOUNDATIONS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NGOZI ENEM BA HONS | Chair | 11 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Berachi | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Ego | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
OSITA ENEM | Trustee | 11 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/07/2020 | 06/07/2021 | 06/07/2022 | 06/07/2023 | 06/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.00k | £1.53k | £10.59k | £3.00k | £25.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £650 | £1.50k | £8.49k | £2.99k | £18.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 July 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 July 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 July 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 July 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 July 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 July 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON 04/04/2013 AMENDED ON 03/05/2013
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT: (A) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A CHARITABLE NEED IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO ORPHANS AND VULNERABLE WOMEN (INCLUDING YOUNG MOTHERS) IN FINANCIAL NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, (B) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN POVERTY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO WOMEN, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, (C) THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH, (D) THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BEING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED (BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY) SO THEY CAN PLAY A FULLER PART IN THEIR COMMUNITIES AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY IMPROVE, (E) THE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE AND TO HELP CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER 25 YEARS BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS, AND (F) THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT B
179B PRINCE OF WALES ROAD
LONDON
NW5 3QB
- Phone:
- 07466 226856
- Email:
- Info@ncifoundations.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window