SUNSHINE FRIENDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating throughout England and Wales to open a world of communication, friendship and support for people with disabilities and their parents or carers.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 March 2013: Standard registration
- 09 April 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- SPECIAL FRIENDS SUNSHINE CLUB (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JAN 2013 AS AMENDED ON 17/03/2013 AS AMENDED ON 21/01/2014
Charitable objects
TO HELP RELIEVE THE NEED OF YOUNG PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window