JAMIA MUHAMMADIYAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Islamic Faith for the public benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Calderdale
Governance
- 20 May 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAFIZ ZAHEER IQBAL KHAN | Chair | 19 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR WAJID ALI | Trustee | 19 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR MOHAMMED SUBHAN ANWAR | Trustee | 19 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ZAHIR HANIF | Trustee | 19 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.31k | £12.30k | £12.44k | £30.31k | £123.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.66k | £13.79k | £11.49k | £19.06k | £28.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 06 January 2025 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 January 2024
(These accounts |
06 January 2025 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 January 2025 | 403 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 January 2023
(These accounts |
06 January 2025 | 403 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 12 December 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 12 December 2022 | 377 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 12 December 2022 | 742 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 FEB 2013
Charitable objects
THE AIMS AND OBJECTIVES OF THE ORGANISATION SHALL BE: A)TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 Bradford Road
Huddersfield
HD1 6DZ
- Phone:
- 01484431999
- Email:
- mateen786_6@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window