Financial history FRIENDS OF THE HUNTLEY ARCHIVES AT LMA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1152314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £9.51k £49.69k £15.11k £19.92k £17.13k
Total expenditure £4.46k £5.94k £32.88k £23.25k £32.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A