DORRIDGE SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The scout association has the following clear purpose: to help young people achieve their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potential as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local national and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Solihull
Governance
- 23 July 1974: Standard registration
- 1ST DORRIDGE SCOUTS UNIT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Rosemary Long | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Mumford | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Claude Paulo | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Derick Alvin Cottell | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
John William Collins | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Carmen Hickman | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Michelle Vergo | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Buck | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Anne Bilney | Trustee | 22 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Lis Hedley | Trustee | 22 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.08k | £21.46k | £7.75k | £27.69k | £46.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.25k | £10.80k | £10.00k | £17.15k | £65.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £7.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
DORRIDGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 Wychwood Avenue
Knowle
Solihull
B93 9DQ
- Phone:
- 01564775880
- Email:
- lis.hedley@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window