Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL EDUCATION AND POVERTY RELIEF

Charity number: 1152795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 December 2023 02 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2023 02 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 December 2022 08 May 2024 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2022 08 May 2024 201 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 20 December 2020 13 January 2022 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 20 December 2019 18 November 2020 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2019 Not Required