GSM EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of GSM Educational Trust is to provide the students of GSM London with access to higher education, e.g. through the provision of scholarships, bursaries and grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 08 January 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Pryce | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Mrs A Devine | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Melvyn Keen | Trustee | 29 March 2017 |
|
|||||||
Christy Traore | Trustee | 07 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.05k | £50.05k | £42 | £17 | £2.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £28.16k | £28.10k | £44.97k | £3.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | |||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 NOV 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/12/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: 1) AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES AND GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY INSTITUTION OR COLLEGE OF HIGHER EDUCATION; 2) PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE COMMUNITY; 3) PROMOTING COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT BY ENCOURAGING ACCESS TO HIGHER EDUCATION AND PREPARING FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PORTLAND BUILDING
25 HIGH STREET
CRAWLEY
RH10 1BG
- Phone:
- 0845 057 0700
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window