THE TURNBULL CRICKET AND FOOTBALL GROUNDS

Charity number: 503531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE GROUNDS ARE CURRENTLY USED BY WHITBY TOWN FOOTBALL CLUB AND WHITBY CRICKET CLUB

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023

Total income: £2,729
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 August 1974: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL ANTHONY CROSSLING Chair 02 October 2017
None on record
ALAN DAVID WRIGHT Trustee
None on record
John Leslie McMurran Trustee
None on record
IAN KENNETH HALLEY Trustee
None on record
Michael Crossling Trustee
None on record
JOANNE MARIE BRAITHWAITE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £92 £75 £9 £920 £2.73k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £3.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 11 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 20 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 27 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 16 October 2020 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
COLIN BROWN & KIDSON SOLICITORS
WELLINGTON HOUSE
5 WELLINGTON ROAD
WHITBY
YO21 1BH
Phone:
01947603391
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available