Financial history THE TIN MUSIC AND ARTS

Charity number: 1152636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £180.69k £147.06k £293.01k £165.88k £170.08k
Total expenditure £180.45k £90.81k £186.61k £181.11k £241.05k
Income from government contracts N/A £2.90k £2.00k £7.50k £4.50k
Income from government grants N/A £101.79k £96.50k £34.33k N/A