Accounts and annual returns BARTON UNDER NEEDWOOD CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 503534
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2015 13 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2014 18 September 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required