CHINESE WELFARE AND INFORMATION CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide advocacy service for those have issues around benefits, housing etc. We deliver weekly English classes at varied stages. We encourage our beneficiaries to take up volunteer placements within our project to enable it to become more sustainable. We help our clients to have better access to NHS services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 October 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 05 August 2013: Standard registration
- 22 November 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 12/10/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 12 October 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 12 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 12 October 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 12 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 12 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 12 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 12 October 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 AUG 2011
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE ACROSS THE BLACK COUNTRY WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF OR CREED (IN PARTICULAR, MEMBERS OF THE CHINESE COMMUNITY) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR BY: A. PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF THE CHINESE COMMUNITY TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY. B. INCREASING, OR CO-ORDINATING, OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF THE CHINESE COMMUNITY TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO BETTER MEET THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHINESE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE BLACK COUNTRY WITH LANGUAGE DIFFICULTIES BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF LANGUAGE SUPPORT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window