WATERFORD HOUSE EVANGELICAL FREE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintaining a building at 101 Rede Court Road Strood for pubic worship and other activities. Employing a pastor to lead public worship and provide pastoral care. Providing opportunity for public worship at two services each Sunday and for Bible study and prayer on Tuesday. Providing meetings for men, women, young people and children to learn of biblical Christianity. Supporting other charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Medway
Governance
- 11 April 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Paul Tribe | Chair | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Russell David Weller | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT SCOTT SUTTON | Trustee | 25 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES SILVER | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DAVID CHANDLER | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter Anthony Adams | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|||||
MARTIN CHARLES EARLE | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|||||
BARRY FRANCIS SMALLMAN | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN TOMASCHEK | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS JOHN HAYES | Trustee | 15 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.13k | £82.10k | £113.49k | £82.14k | £98.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.77k | £93.44k | £88.42k | £112.74k | £78.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/10/2012 as amended on 25 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO HOLY SCRIPTURE AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPALS OF THE REFORMED FAITH AND THE CHURCH'S DOCTRINE AS STATED IN THE TRUST DEED. THE CHARITY MAY ALSO SUPPORT OTHER CHARITABLE WORKS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS PRINCIPAL OBJECT, THE CHARITY SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO DO ALL SUCH THINGS AS THE CHURCH OFFICERS, ACTING IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DECISIONS OF THE CHURCH MEMBERS, SHALL CONSIDER APPROPRIATE TO FULFIL OR HELP TO FULFIL THIS PRINCIPAL OBJECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Romsey Close
Rochester
ME2 3TJ
- Phone:
- 01634329881
- Email:
- thesuttons@blueyonder.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window