Governing document HEALTHWATCH SHROPSHIRE

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 SEP 2018 as amended on 01 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY: (A) PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT LOCAL HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE SERVICES; (B) MAKING THE VIEWS AND EXPERIENCES OF MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC KNOWN TO HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PROVIDERS; (C) ENABLING LOCAL PEOPLE TO HAVE A VOICE IN THE DEVELOPMENT, DELIVERY AND EQUALITY OF ACCESS TO LOCAL HEALTH AND CARE SERVICES AND FACILITIES AND; (D) PROVIDING TRAINING AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF SKILLS FOR VOLUNTEERS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY IN UNDERSTANDING, SCRUTINIZING, REVIEWING AND MONITORING LOCAL HEALTH AND CARE SERVICES AND FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
SHROPSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.