Financial history GROVE CHAPEL

Charity number: 1150927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £166.49k £171.10k £171.53k £154.89k £282.33k
Total expenditure £178.11k £153.50k £154.24k £156.44k £132.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A