SHREWSBURY MUSLIM CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the Muslim religion for the benefit of the public through the holding of prayer meetings, lectures and public celebration of religious festivals; To Further or benefit the residents of Shrewsbury and the neighbourhood, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions by associating together the said residents and the local authorities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
Governance
- 15 April 2013: Standard registration
- SBWS (Working name)
- SBWS (SHREWSBURY) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUFU MIAH | Chair | 17 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Mustafa | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Momen Ahmed Chowdhury | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
MUHAMMED AZADUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 17 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
KABIR UDDIN | Trustee | 17 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.19k | £17.70k | £39.48k | £73.03k | £79.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.63k | £2.61k | £14.96k | £50.65k | £66.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 09 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 APR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/07/2014
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE MUSLIM RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES AND PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS. 2.TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF SHREWSBURY AND THE NEIGHBORHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shrewsbury Muslim Centre
Column Lodge
2 Preston Street
SHREWSBURY
SY2 5NY
- Phone:
- 07958916010
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window