Governing document KURDISTAN CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 FEB 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN KURDISTAN AND WORLDWIDE, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): 1. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED WHETHER BECAUSE OF POVERTY, YOUTH, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND THE SAVING OF LIVES; AND 3. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE PUBLIC AND WHICH ARE CONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS STATED ABOVE AS THE TRUSTEE DIRECTORS SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.