Steamship Freshspring Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and ensure future sustainability for SS Freshspring as a working example of 19th and 20th century marine technology for the benefit of the public. To attract young people and provide engineering education facilities to encourage them to consider a career in engineering. To provide facilities to teach basic skills in the management of an historic vessel and steam machinery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £750 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 May 2013: CIO registration
- STEAMSHIP FRESHSPRING SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Puddy | Chair | 18 February 2013 |
|
|||||
Dr Michael Teare | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|||||
William Blythe | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Gooding | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annemarie Shillito | Trustee | 20 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Stephen Attenborough | Trustee | 18 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.23k | £122.38k | £43.09k | £53.95k | £129.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.16k | £51.42k | £110.93k | £62.89k | £122.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.45k | £2.00k | £450 | £450 | £750 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 30 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 07 MAY 2013 AMENDED ON 04 JUL 2016 as amended on 09 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PRESERVATION AND OPERATION OF A STEAMSHIP, AND THE PROMOTION OF MARITIME STUDIES PARTICULARLY AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Cleave
Lower Cleave
Northam
Bideford
EX39 2RH
- Phone:
- 01237479730
- Email:
- info@ssfreshspring.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window