THE MARGARET BELL SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We advance the education and health and wellbeing of orphaned and poor children of Kitwe Zambia who are unable to access government education. We provide education up to Grade 8 for students from the age of 2 up to 25 years old and advance their learning of the English language.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Zambia
Governance
- 24 April 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERESA MARGARET BELL | Chair | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Louise Upton | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne Beale | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Ellen Bell | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Leah Ellen Bell | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michaela Louise John | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Gilman | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
KIRSTIE ANN BELL | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.12k | £1.42k | £2.07k | £7.68k | £9.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.81k | £7.34k | £1.77k | £10.08k | £12.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Apr 2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF ORPHANED AND POOR CHILDREN OF KITWE, ZAMBIA, WHO ARE UNABLE TO ACCESS GOVERNMENT EDUCATION, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: · PROVIDING ACCOMMODATION, TEACHERS AND ASSISTANTS, CLOTHING AND NUTRITION AT THE MARGARET BELL SCHOOL, KITWE, ZAMBIA; · EDUCATING PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL FROM THE AGE OF TWO YEARS AND UP TO THE AGE OF 25 YEARS; · PROVIDING THEIR GENERAL EDUCATION UP TO GRADE 8, TO PREPARE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION OR TRANSFER TO A GOVERNMENT FUNDED SCHOOL / COLLEGE; · ADVANCING THEIR LEARNING OF THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Abbey Field
Castle Road
Hartshill
Nuneaton
CV10 0SE
- Phone:
- 02476394161
- Email:
- margaretbellschool@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window