MARYLAND STUDIOZ
Charity number: 1152370
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is currently dormant
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income: £7,488
Total expenditure: £6,950
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
How the charity helps:
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
- Waltham Forest
Governance
Registration history:
- 11 June 2013: Standard registration
- 09 September 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- MARYLAND STUDIOZ1 (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £7.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £6.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 20 April 2017 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 01 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 SEP 2011 AS AMENDED ON 10/06/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN EAST LONDON IN THE SUBJECT OF STREET DANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window