CENTER FOR INNER SCIENCES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of Vedic religion through practice of Patanjali Yoga Mediation, by conducting meditation and Samkhya courses throughout England
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 April 2013: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nina Manher Vyas | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
VIBHA CALE | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.50k | £14.09k | £16.96k | £13.08k | £23.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.98k | £14.69k | £16.79k | £17.89k | £22.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 932 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1297 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1662 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1662 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON 08/04/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE VEDIC RELIGION FOR THE MORAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OF PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEN PRINCIPLES OF THE ARYA SAMAJ AS OUTLINED BY SVAMI DAYANANDA SARASVATI (1825-83), BY: I. PRACTICE AND PROMOTION OF PATANJALI YOGA MEDITATION OUTSIDE OF OUR MEDITATION GATHERINGS II. ENCOURAGING PEACE AND HEALTH BY PROMOTING VEGETARIANISM, TEETOTALISM, AND ENVIRONMENTALISM III. FACILITATING AND BEING INVOLVED IN RESEARCH PERTAINING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO HUMAN HISTORY, LITERATURE RELEVANT TO PATANJALI YOGA AND OTHER BRANCHES OF THE VEDIC LITERATURE AND PRINCIPLES IV. DISSEMINATION OF SUCH KNOWLEDGE THROUGH A) PUBLICATIONS OF BOOKS, PERIODICALS, NEWSLETTERS IN PRINT AND ELECTRONIC/DIGITAL MEDIA, AND THEIR PUBLICITY, DISPLAY AND DISTRIBUTION BY SALE/GIFT, B) PRODUCTION OF FILMS AND OTHER MEANS OF PERFORMING ARTS AND THEIR DISPLAY, DISTRIBUTION AND SALE/GIFT, C) ORGANIZING CONFERENCES, SEMINARS, DEBATES, LECTURES, TALKS, PANEL DISCUSSIONS, FILM FESTIVALS, PLAYS, DRAMAS, AND ANY OTHER MEANS.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
CENTER FOR INNER SCIENCES
Regus
Exchange House
494 Midsummer Boulevard
MILTON KEYNES
MK9 2EA
- Phone:
- 01908592013
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window