Accounts and annual returns FREE ME

Charity number: 1152120
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2021 21 April 2022 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 21 April 2022 142 days late
Annual return 31 January 2020 21 April 2022 507 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 21 April 2022 507 days late
Annual return 31 January 2019 22 February 2020 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 22 February 2020 84 days late