FREE ME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Free Me provides free care and support to those recovering from eating disorders and addictions. In addition to traditional group and one on one therapy, we run a jewellery making workshop that our members attend to grow their confidence, self-esteem and skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- RECOVER (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.87k | £8.23k | £24.67k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.61k | £21.93k | £34.46k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | £3.26k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 21 April 2022 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 21 April 2022 | 142 days late | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 21 April 2022 | 507 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 21 April 2022 | 507 days late | |
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 22 February 2020 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | 22 February 2020 | 84 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 May 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: 3.1 RELIEVE THOSE WITH OR VULNERABLE TO ANOREXIA NERVOSA, BULIMIA NERVOSA OR ANY OTHER EATING DISORDERS OF ANY KIND (COLLECTIVELY REFERRED TO AS “EATING DISORDERS” IN THIS CONSTITUTION); AND/OR 3.2 RELIEVE THOSE WHO ARE DEPENDENT ON OR AFFECTED BY CONSUMPTION OF NARCOTIC DRUGS OR SIMILAR SUBSTANCES OR ALCOHOL (COLLECTIVELY REFERRED TO AS “ADDICTION” IN THIS CONSTITUTION); 3.3 RELIEVE THOSE IN OR TO PREVENT POVERTY AS A RESULT OF ANY: 3.3.1 EATING DISORDER; AND/OR 3.3.2 ADDICTION; 3.4 ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND THE FAMILIES OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM ANY EATING DISORDERS OR ADDICTION BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND INFORMATION; AND 3.5 ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window