THE FRIENDS OF ST. EDMUND HALL BOAT CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The support of rowing at St Edmund Hall Boat Club by providing advice, funding, equipment and coaching. We encourage rowing and give financial support to rowers training for competitive events by subsidising training camps, paying for coaching and ancillary expenses, such as travel costs; we also purchase rowing equipment for use by the boat club which is leased to it for a notional annual rent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 02 April 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Jackson | Trustee | 09 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Hope MA FCA MBA | Trustee | 09 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Taylor BA DPhil | Trustee | 03 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Charles Ali Samir Salih BA | Trustee | 05 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.99k | £27.94k | £54.04k | £37.03k | £22.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.06k | £31.85k | £29.29k | £27.09k | £40.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 JUN 2008 AS AMENDED ON 31/05/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ("THE OBJECTS")ARE: 1)TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF STUDENTS OF ALL ABILITIES AT ST EDMUND HALL, OXFORD (THE "COLLEGE") BY PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORT OF ROWING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, EQUIPMENT AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT 2)TO APPLY THE FUNDS AND OTHER PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY (INCLUDING THOSE HELD BY THE COMPANY ESTABLISHED AND WHOLLY OWNED BY THE CHARITY) IN PURSUANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 School Lane
Wargrave
Reading
RG10 8AA
- Phone:
- 01225 834316
- Email:
- dhope@netsuite.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window