Accounts and annual returns JAKE MCCARTHY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1151542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 11 January 2024 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 January 2024 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 11 January 2023 15 April 2024 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 11 January 2023 15 April 2024 156 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 11 January 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 January 2022 07 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 11 January 2021 01 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 January 2021 01 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 11 January 2020 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 11 January 2020 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window