Financial history JAKE MCCARTHY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1151542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 11/01/2020 11/01/2021 11/01/2022 11/01/2023 11/01/2024
Total gross income £36.27k £5.50k £6.82k £3.30k £1.62k
Total expenditure £59.24k £56.22k £50.53k £3 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A