Trustees USK IN BLOOM

Charity number: 1152881
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Gwyn Williams Chair 16 September 2020
None on record
Anthony Kear Trustee 29 January 2025
None on record
enid may snelgrove Trustee 15 August 2024
None on record
John Michael Pickering Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
Jennifer Lynne Davies Trustee 08 September 2021
None on record
Janet Mundy Trustee 16 September 2020
None on record
Alison Williams Trustee 16 September 2020
None on record