HAPPYCATS RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue and rehome unwanted cats and kittens Neutering service to the public where families are on a low income Mobile microchipping service TNR for feral cats
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
- Surrey
- West Berkshire
- West Sussex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 March 2013: Standard registration
- HAPPYCATS RESCUE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MISS JO LUCAS | Chair | 25 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Karen Tasker | Trustee | 04 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Hunter | Trustee | 04 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Stevens | Trustee | 13 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Arthur | Trustee | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.52k | £12.94k | £10.82k | £22.49k | £25.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.51k | £3.78k | £2.95k | £16.18k | £20.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/02/2013 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY WILL BE AS FOLLOWS: - FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF CATS AND KITTENS WHICH ARE UNWANTED AND/OR IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN HAMPSHIRE, SURREY AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES, BY RESCUING AND RE-HOMING THEM AND PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THEIR RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT. - TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS CATS AND KITTENS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR CATS WHICH ARE IN NEED, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY NEUTERING, VACCINATING AND MICRO-CHIPPING. - TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO THE WELFARE OF CATS AND KITTENS, ESPECIALLY ABOUT THE CONSEQUENCES OF IRRESPONSIBLE BREEDING AND BY PROMOTING AN ACTIVE NEUTERING SCHEME. - RAISING FUNDS TO CONTINUE TO NEUTER, VACCINATE AND MICROCHIP ALL CATS AND KITTENS WHO COME THROUGH THE RESCUE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 St. Andrews Road
Whitehill
Bordon
GU35 9QN
- Phone:
- 07881557648
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window