SPECTRUM DAYS

Charity number: 1151711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Spectrum Days has been established to provide specialist support to people with PMLD (profound and multiple learning difficulties) and their families from birth, through life with: Short Breaks, Advisory service, Counseling , The PMLD Hub - Resources, Equipment and Additional Services. To provide people with PMLD with Purpose/Meaning/Living/Dignity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Sandwell
  • Solihull
  • Warwickshire
  • Wolverhampton
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 April 2013: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Derek Radcliffe Chair 17 April 2018
DROITWICH SPA AND RURAL COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE
Received: On time
Helen Dawn Kimberley Trustee 02 December 2024
None on record
Diane Rosina Hughes Trustee 02 April 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £719.87k £721.91k £824.70k £1.04m £1.35m
Total expenditure £686.09k £660.71k £827.69k £1.03m £1.26m
Income from government contracts £690.04k £563.17k £714.16k £1.02m £1.25m
Income from government grants N/A £51.67k £34.89k £6.50k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £26.92k £158.66k £110.53k £22.83k £80.71k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £690.04k £563.17k £714.16k £1.02m £1.25m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £58 £351
Income - Other £2.92k £83 £0 £0 £12.64k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £660.15k £586.39k £827.69k £1.03m £1.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £797 £138 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £690 £5.03k £5.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £25.15k £74.19k £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Own use assets £8.63k £49.98k £95.12k £180.85k £158.29k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £158.71k £273.70k £221.49k £213.27k £315.54k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £123.34k £218.48k £214.41k £285.55k £273.93k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 28 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 28 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 15 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 15 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 28 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 28 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 28 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 21 May 2021 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 21 May 2021 82 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Spectrum Days
Old Coach Road
Droitwich
WR9 8BB
Phone:
01905773725