Trustees THE WHITE HORSE SHOW TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1151533

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna-Louise Rachel Ashcroft | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Fiona Ward | Trustee | 07 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Brett Michael Artus | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
CALLUM SKEAT | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Whitfield | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ed Preece | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.