KABUKI UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide information, education and awareness of Kabuki Syndrome. Establish a network of regional contacts. Provide family days and opportunities for Kabuki sufferers and their families to meet. Future aim to provide financial benefits by way of equipment funding and other assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 February 2013: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Dee Trewartha | Chair | 24 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Katy Blackmore | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rory Colin Brown | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
BETH HANNAH BUDGEN | Trustee | 24 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
LISA KAREN JOHNSTON | Trustee | 24 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.15k | £5.67k | £12.64k | £7.55k | £8.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.53k | £8.85k | £19.90k | £5.02k | £21.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 17 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 01 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09 FEB 2013
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF KABUKI SYNDROME. 2) TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF KABUKI SYNDROME IN THE UNITED KINGDOM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE (INCLUDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE FOR FAMILY MEMBERS AND OTHER CARERS OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM KABUKI SYNDROME).
Contact information
- Address:
-
1a Baldwins Hill
LOUGHTON
IG10 1SA
- Phone:
- 07946433444
- Email:
- sallytrewartha@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window