THE ACHILLES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Achilles Trust aims to support the promotion and encouragement of athletics amongst students of Oxford and Cambridge Universities. It supports athletics fixtures of these students, in particular the Transatlantic Series of fixtures with US universities. It can also support other charitable educational purposes, in particular relating to the encouragement of athletics generally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 July 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Crosse | Trustee | 12 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Joan Lasenby | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Joanna Elizabeth Cripps | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ailsa Cameron Wallace | Trustee | 29 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Helen Ruth Wheeler | Trustee | 29 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL DAVID TALBOT WILLCOX | Trustee | 29 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/12/2019 | 30/12/2020 | 30/12/2021 | 30/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.35k | £87.54k | £18.52k | £32.61k | £29.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.81k | £5.78k | £16.04k | £31.05k | £38.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30/12/1965 AS AMENDED ON 27/01/2014
Charitable objects
THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TUST PROPERTY SHALL AFTER THE PAYMENT THERE OUT OF ALL COSTS AND EXPENSES BE HELD AND APPLIED AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE: (1)(A) THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF ATHLETICS AMONG STUDENTS IN STATU PUPILLARI FOR THE TIME BEING STUDYING AT OXFORD UNIVERSITY OR CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY (HERINAFTER CALLED "STUDENTS IN STATU PUPILLARI") AND THE PROVISION OF SUITABLE TRAINING GROUNDS ACCOMODATION AND COACHING FOR SUCH PURPOSES: (B) THE PROMOTION ARRANGEMENT OR ENCOURAGEMENT OF ATHLETICS MATCHES IN WHICH STUDENTS IN STATU PUPILLARI WHETHER WITH OR WITHOUT OTHER PERSONS SHALL TAKE PART WHETHER SUCH MATCHES BE WITH SCHOOLS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR COMMONWEALTH TEAMS OR FOREIGN UNIVERSITIES OR ANY OTHER PERSONS: INCLUDING THE PAYMENT OF OR CONTRIBUTION TOWARDS THE TRAVELLING OR OTHER NECESSARY INCIDENTAL EXPENSES INCURRED BY ANY PERSON OR PERSONS BEING STUDENTS IN STATU PUPILLARI OF THE TWO UNIVERSITIES TAKING PART IN ANY SUCH MATCH WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD (2) SUCH OTHER EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN LAW AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THEIR DISCRETION UNDER THIS DEED THE TRUSTEES (SO FAR AS THEY SHALL CONSIDER IT PRACTICABLE AND DESIRABLE) SHALL REGARD THE OBJECTS DECLARED IN SUB-CLAUSE (1) OF THIS CLAUSE AS THE PRIMARY OBJECTS OF THE TRUST TOWARDS WHICH TRUST PROPERTY AND THE INCOME THEREOF SHALL BE APPLIED AND PROVIDED FURTHER THAT NO PURPOSE SHALL BE AN OBJECT OF THE TRUST WHICH IS NOT LEGALLY A CHARITABLE PURPOSE AND THE TRUSTS POWERS AND PROVISIONS OF THIS DEED SHALL AT ALL TIMES BE CONSTRUED AND TAKE EFFECT SUBJECT TO THIS PROVISION
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Tudor Close
WOODFORD GREEN
IG8 0LF
- Phone:
- 02070181920
- Email:
- trust@achilles.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window