Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST FLORENCE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1151429
Charity reporting is up to date (227 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 12 February 2025 227 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 October 2022 12 February 2025 557 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 October 2021 14 September 2022 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 October 2020 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 October 2019 30 September 2020 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2019 Not Required