Financial history FRIENDS OF ST FLORENCE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1151429
Charity reporting is up to date (227 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/10/2019 05/10/2020 05/10/2021 05/10/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £2.31k £1.44k £1.15k £9.07k £12.46k
Total expenditure £3.28k £3.20k £147 £4.48k £11.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A