NEIGHBOURHOOD INVESTMENT IN COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE (NICE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have set up a community centre in the Halliwell area of Bolton working in partnership with Bolton Council. We help and support other community groups and local charities. We have set up a small food bank with a soup kitchen feeding people in need. We have setup a community toolbox to share tools and equipment with other charities and community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
Governance
- 02 August 2013: Standard registration
- BOLTON NICE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN MCLOUGHLIN | Chair | 05 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
gary wade | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
alex McAllister | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.44k | £7.44k | £6.36k | £11.43k | £11.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.62k | £3.29k | £5.33k | £6.98k | £6.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.21k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 August 2022 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 19 July 2021 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 July 2020 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16/07/2013
Charitable objects
1.TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BOLTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. 2.THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE RECYCLING AND PROVISION OF FURNITURE, CLOTHES AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS AND THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY TOOLBOXES FOR USE ON COMMUNITY PROJECTS. 3.TO PROVIDE AFFORDABLE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT FACILITIES IN BOLTON FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE THEY ARE ELDERLY, POOR OR DISABLED., PEOPLE WITH YOUNG CHILDREN OR THOSE LIVING IN ISOLATED AREAS WHERE NO ADEQUATE PUBLIC TRANSPORT FACILITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 PETERSFIELD WALK
BOLTON
BL1 2XG
- Phone:
- 07900535403
- Email:
- boltonnice1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window