CHRISTIAN COMMUNITIES NETWORK HUDDERSFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GIVING SUPPORT, GUIDANCE AND DIRECTION TO LOCAL CHURCHES AND OTHER CHRISTIAN COMMUNITIES; RUNNING TRAINING EVENTS AND OFFERING CONSULTATION APPOINTMENTS; PROVIDING SERVICES SUCH AS DBS CHECKS AND SHARED COMMUNICATION; RUNNING OR HELPING LOCAL CHURCHES RUN EVENTS INCLUDING SUNDAY SERVICES AND OTHER COMMUNITY EVENTS; RUNNING JOINT EVENTS FOR ALL MEMBER CHURCHES AND OTHER CHRISTIAN COMMUNITIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kirklees
Governance
- 12 April 2013: CIO registration
- CCN AND/OR CCNH (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Michael Reid | Chair | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Steve Hurd | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARK ROGER HANBURY BROOKE | Trustee | 06 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.08k | £1.15k | £6.50k | £1.45k | £1.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.57k | £1.02k | £2.63k | £2.60k | £4.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 March 2022 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 March 2022 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 12 Apr 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE HUDDERSFIELD AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elim Pentecostal Church
23 St. Johns Road
HUDDERSFIELD
HD1 5BW
- Phone:
- 01484535554
- Email:
- hopehuddersfield@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window