CALL OF THE SAINTS INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY CHURCH OF THE SAINTS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding regular services to promote the christian faith in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Greenwich
Governance
- 01 March 2013: Standard registration
- 09 June 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- CALL OF THE SAINTS INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.35k | £1.24k | £5.32k | £4.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.21k | £1.24k | £5.32k | £4.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 21 March 2018 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 01 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ORGANISATION'S ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window