RIBCAGED PRODUCTIONS LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ribcaged is a theatre production company based in the Ribble Valley. We provide theatre productions for public entertainment and we work within schools in the region offering a range of events, workshops and learning support for the National Curricuulm We engage with young people through Youth Theatre and Drama Clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £5,911 from 4 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Lancashire
Governance
- 24 April 2013: Standard registration
- 11 June 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- RIBCAGED (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.32k | £74.16k | £53.27k | £40.69k | £19.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.20k | £103.57k | £64.13k | £40.89k | £29.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.26k | £19.49k | N/A | N/A | £5.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 July 2022 | 165 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 MAR 2010
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE ART OF DRAMA;AND 2.TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES, TO ALL PEOPLE INCLUDING YOUNG PEOPLE, FOR ENGAGEMENT WITH DRAMA AND RELATED ASPECTS OF THEATRE PRODUCTION TO A WIDE RANGE OF PARTICIPANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window