THE HELEN SUZMAN FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity will: Promote understanding of South Africa in the UK and foster contact between them Defend civil and human rights in South Africa, including freedom of the press, freedom of association, preservation of an independent judiciary, the right to vote by free and fair elections and preservation of the rule of law Promote equal opportunity, a humane society and racial harmony
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- South Africa
Governance
- 19 February 2014: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL SIMON SUZMAN JOWELL QC | Chair | 11 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Terence Clive Moll | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN DOCTOR QC | Trustee | 11 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10 | £27.50k | £10.00k | £11 | £28 | |
|
Total expenditure | £900 | £20.90k | £20.94k | £939 | £900 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 08 February 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10/02/2014
Charitable objects
4.1 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SOUTH AFRICA AND THE UK THROUGH THE SUPPORT AND PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS, IN PARTICULAR IN RELATION TO THE LIFE AND LEGACY OF THE LATE HELEN SUZMAN AND THE ACTIVITIES AND WORKS OF THE HELEN SUZMAN FOUNDATION SOUTH AFRICA. 4.2 TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS AND FREEDOMS AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN SOUTH AFRICA, (INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR THE RIGHTS AND FREEDOMS, AS RECORDED IN THE SAID UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF FREEDOM OF EXPRESSION AND OF THE PRESS, FREEDOM OF ASSOCIATION, PREVENTION OF INHUMAN OR DEGRADING TREATMENT OR PUNISHMENT, PRESERVATION OF AN INDEPENDENT JUDICIARY, THE RIGHT TO VOTE BY FREE AND FAIR ELECTIONS AND THE PRESERVATION OF THE RULE OF LAW), BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 4.2.1 RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; 4.2.2 SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; 4.2.3 PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; 4.2.4 CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; 4.2.5 COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; 4.2.6 RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; 4.2.7 PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; 4.2.8 PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; 4.2.9 ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS 4.3 THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 4.3.1 THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY , SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; 4.3.2 ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY, IN PARTICULAR ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; 4.3.3 PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS OR DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; 4.3.4 CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; 4.3.5 CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF, AND WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF, EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Elsworthy Road
LONDON
NW3 3DL
- Phone:
- 07788454145
- Email:
- danjowell@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window