Accounts and annual returns ST FINBARRS SPORTING LIMITED
Charity number: 1152539

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 15 January 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
28 February 2023
(These accounts |
15 January 2024 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 198 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
28 February 2022
(These accounts |
14 July 2023 | 198 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 11 May 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 11 May 2022 | 134 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 10 June 2021 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 10 June 2021 | 163 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window