Accounts and annual returns EAST AFRICAN WILD LIFE SOCIETY (UK)

Charity number: 1153041
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 24 January 2023 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 02 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 31 December 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required