Financial history EAST AFRICAN WILD LIFE SOCIETY (UK)

Charity number: 1153041
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023
Total gross income £163 £153 £5.16k £0 £0
Total expenditure £433 £493 £658 £480 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A