Accounts and annual returns AUTISM SUPPORT AND ADVICE

Charity number: 1153099
Charity reporting is overdue by 1505 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days
Accounts and TAR 29 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 44 days
Annual return 29 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 409 days
Accounts and TAR 29 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 409 days
Annual return 29 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 775 days
Accounts and TAR 29 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 775 days
Annual return 29 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1140 days
Accounts and TAR 29 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1140 days
Annual return 29 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1505 days
Accounts and TAR 29 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1505 days