THE SEVEN SOWERS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our current main activity is to provide funding for the continued employment of our Children's Schools' and Families' Worker.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Somerset
Governance
- 12 April 2013: Standard registration
- SEVEN SOWERS (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Joanna Kathryn Porter | Chair | 08 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Richard Hans Bailey | Trustee | 27 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth McKen | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
MRS E FRAZER | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
MRS A HORSEY | Trustee | 14 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.62k | £16.01k | £20.93k | £21.07k | £16.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.01k | £13.85k | £14.69k | £20.96k | £22.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 OCT 2004 as amended on 14 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE BENEFICE OF BEERCROCOMBE WITH CURRY MALLET, HATCH BEAUCHAMP, ORCHARD PORTMAN, STAPLE FITZPAINE, STOKE ST MARY WITH THURLBEAR AND WEST HATCH IN THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND DIOCESE OF BATH AND WELLS, OR SUCH OTHER GEOGRAPHICAL AREA AS SHALL BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME ("THE BENEFICE") FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEFS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. (B) TO CREATE AND MAINTAIN A CHARITABLE FUND FROM WHICH EXPENSES OF THE BENEFICE CAN BE MET (C) TO CREATE A CENTRAL CHARITABLE FUND TO WHICH DONATIONS CAN BE MADE AND USED IN THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES TO FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fairways
West Hatch
Taunton
TA3 5RS
- Phone:
- 01823481013
- Email:
- horseyfarm@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window