VICTORY OUTREACH WEST LONDON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Victory Outreach is part of an international, church-oriented Christian Ministry called to the task of evangelizing and discipling the hurting people of the world, with the message of hope and plan of Jesus Christ. Victory Outreach West London exists to Exalt Christ, Envision and Establish people in faith to reach their potentials and Equip the saints to Evangelise the world with God's Word.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bexley
- Camden
- Ealing
- Hackney
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 22 April 2013: Standard registration
- 22 September 2020: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 22 September 2020: Funds transferred to 1176302 Victory Outreach London City Church
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.76k | £55.24k | £62.79k | £70.18k | £38.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.25k | £54.95k | £70.90k | £68.01k | £47.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 22 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | 22 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 21 August 2019 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | 21 August 2019 | 197 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 05 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | 12 February 2018 | 7 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 NOV 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN WEST LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window