NORTH TAMESIDE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Scouting in the Ashton-under-Lyne/Droylsden area of Tameside. Providing support and training for Leaders across the district enabling them to deliver the Scout programme within their Scout Groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Tameside
Governance
- 03 September 1974: Standard registration
- North Tameside District Scout Council (Working name)
- NORTH TAMESIDE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL TL/239I (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Morton Dist Comm | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Roddy Appo Sec | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Winifred Mary Fish Dist Sec | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Casey Badge Sec | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Fish Chair | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Noreen Duncalf Treas | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Mee DESC | Trustee | 13 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
HARRY FRANKISH GSL | Trustee |
|
||||||
Ken Marks Appo Chair | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.86k | £7.63k | £15.30k | £22.15k | £17.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.56k | £7.38k | £270 | £33.34k | £20.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES"
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Clarence Road
ASHTON-UNDER-LYNE
Lancashire
OL6 8JE
- Phone:
- 07931765120
- Email:
- alan.fish@ntscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window